British Columbia
Vancouver
Vancouver
Chair
active
2011 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society - Joined on: 2009-01-01
Left on: 2012-05-10
2010 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society - Joined on: 2009-01-01
Left on: 2011-04-27
2009 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society - Joined on: 2009-01-01
Left on: 2009-12-31
2008 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society -
2011 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - Joined on: 2011-02-06
Left on: 2012-02-04
2010 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - Joined on: 2010-01-25
Left on: 2011-02-05
2009 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - Joined on: 2009-02-01
Left on: 2010-01-24
2008 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church -
2006 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church -
2005 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church -
2004 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church -
2003 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church -
2002 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - Occupation RETIRED
Served for 12 months
2001 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - Occupation RETIRED
Served for 12 months
2011 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society - position: chair - Arm's Length: yes
2010 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2009 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2008 - H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society - Arm's Length: yes
2011 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of managers - Arm's Length: yes
2010 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of managers - Arm's Length: yes
2009 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of managers - Arm's Length: yes
2008 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of managers - Arm's Length: yes
2006 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of manager - Arm's Length: yes
2005 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of manages - Arm's Length: yes
2004 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of managers - Arm's Length: yes
2003 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of managers - Arm's Length: yes
2002 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of managers
2001 - St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church - position: board of manager
H.r. Macmillan Space Centre Society
St. Andrew's Presbyterian Church
No associations
LandOfFree
Eric Pringle does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this person.
If you have personal experience with Eric Pringle, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Eric Pringle will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFCA-CHO-P-1205855