Ontario
Niagara Region
St. Catharines
Administrator
active
2011 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - Joined on: 2011-01-30
Left on: 2012-01-29
2010 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - Joined on: 2011-01-30
2009 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - Joined on: 2009-01-11
Left on: 2010-01-24
2008 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society -
2007 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society -
2006 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society -
2005 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society -
2004 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society -
2003 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society -
2000 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - Occupation RETIRED
Served for 12 months
2011 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - Arm's Length: yes
2010 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: vice-chairman - Arm's Length: yes
2009 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: vice president - Arm's Length: yes
2008 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: vice president - Arm's Length: yes
2007 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2006 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: yon - Arm's Length: yes
2005 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2004 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2003 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2000 - Haiti Lutheran Mission Society - position: chairman
No associations
LandOfFree
Gerald E. Higenell does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this person.
If you have personal experience with Gerald E. Higenell, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Gerald E. Higenell will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFCA-CHO-P-65477