Ontario
Kingston
Kingston
Director
active
2011 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - Joined on: 2009-11-07
Left on: 2011-10-22
2010 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - Joined on: 2009-11-07
Left on: 2011-11-07
2009 - The John Howard Society Of Canada -
2008 - The John Howard Society Of Canada -
2007 - The John Howard Society Of Canada -
2006 - The John Howard Society Of Canada -
2005 - The John Howard Society Of Canada -
2010 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - Joined on: 1999-02-20
2010 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - Joined on: 2006-06-10
2008 - John Howard Society Of Ontario -
2007 - John Howard Society Of Ontario -
2006 - John Howard Society Of Ontario -
2005 - John Howard Society Of Ontario -
2004 - John Howard Society Of Ontario -
2003 - John Howard Society Of Ontario -
2002 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - Occupation LAND REGISTRAR RETIRED
Served for 0 months
2001 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - Served for 0 months
2000 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - Served for 0 months
2011 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2010 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2009 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - position: secretary/treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2008 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - position: sec/treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2007 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - position: treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2006 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2005 - The John Howard Society Of Canada - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2010 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: director - Arm's Length: yes
2010 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2008 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2007 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2006 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2005 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2004 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: treasurer - Arm's Length: yes
2003 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: affiliate representative - Arm's Length: yes
2002 - John Howard Society Of Ontario - position: affiliate rep - sarnia
2001 - John Howard Society Of Ontario
2000 - John Howard Society Of Ontario
John Howard Society Of Ontario
The John Howard Society Of Canada
No associations
LandOfFree
Ken Doan does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this person.
If you have personal experience with Ken Doan, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ken Doan will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFCA-CHO-P-1412912