British Columbia
Vancouver
North Vancouver
Board Member
active
2009 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - Joined on: 2008-07-01
Left on: 2008-11-12
2008 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association -
2007 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association -
2006 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association -
2005 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association -
2004 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association -
2003 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association -
2002 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - Occupation RETIRED
Served for 12 months
2001 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - Occupation RETIRED
Served for 12 months
2010 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church -
2009 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church -
2008 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church -
2007 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church -
2006 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church -
2005 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church -
2004 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church -
2011 - The Spiritual Assembly Of The Baha'is Of Saltspring Island F - Joined on: 2010-04-21
Left on: 2011-04-20
2010 - The Spiritual Assembly Of The Baha'is Of Saltspring Island F - Joined on: 2009-04-21
Left on: 2010-04-21
2009 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: member - Arm's Length: yes
2008 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: vice chairperson - Arm's Length: yes
2007 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: vice chairman - Arm's Length: yes
2006 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: vice chairman - Arm's Length: yes
2005 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: board member - Arm's Length: yes
2004 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: board member - Arm's Length: yes
2003 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: board member - Arm's Length: yes
2002 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: board member
2001 - Lions Gate Christian Academy Association - position: board member
2010 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church - position: session member - Arm's Length: yes
2009 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church - position: session member - Arm's Length: yes
2008 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church - position: session member - Arm's Length: yes
2007 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church - position: session member - Arm's Length: yes
2006 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church - position: session member - Arm's Length: yes
2005 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church - position: session member - Arm's Length: yes
2004 - St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church - position: session member - Arm's Length: yes
2011 - The Spiritual Assembly Of The Baha'is Of Saltspring Island F - position: member - Arm's Length: yes
2010 - The Spiritual Assembly Of The Baha'is Of Saltspring Island F - position: member - Arm's Length: yes
St. Andrew's And St. Stephen's Presbyterian Church
The Spiritual Assembly Of The Baha'is Of Saltspring Island F
LandOfFree
Margaret Williams does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this person.
If you have personal experience with Margaret Williams, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Margaret Williams will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFCA-CHO-P-573157